87R12268 CXP-D By: Miles S.B. No. 1624 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the governing body of the independent organization certified to manage the ERCOT power region. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 39.151, Utilities Code, is amended by amending Subsections (g) and (g-1) and adding Subsection (g-2) to read as follows: (g) To maintain certification as an independent organization under this section, an organization's governing body must be composed of persons specified by this section [and selected in accordance with formal bylaws or protocols of the organization. The bylaws or protocols must be approved by the commission and must reflect the input of the commission. The bylaws must specify the process by which appropriate stakeholders elect members and, for unaffiliated members, prescribe professional qualifications for selection as a member. The bylaws must require the use of a professional search firm to identify candidates for membership of unaffiliated members. The process must allow for commission input in identifying candidates]. The governing body must be composed of: (1) the chairman of the commission as an ex officio nonvoting member; and (2) eight members appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate, with: (A) six members representing various market segments; and (B) two members representing consumer interests [the counsellor as an ex officio voting member representing residential and small commercial consumer interests; [(3) the chief executive officer of the independent organization as an ex officio voting member; [(4) six market participants elected by their respective market segments to serve one-year terms, with: [(A) one representing independent generators; [(B) one representing investor-owned utilities; [(C) one representing power marketers; [(D) one representing retail electric providers; [(E) one representing municipally owned utilities; and [(F) one representing electric cooperatives; [(5) one member representing industrial consumer interests and elected by the industrial consumer market segment to serve a one-year term; [(6) one member representing large commercial consumer interests selected in accordance with the bylaws to serve a one-year term; and [(7) five members unaffiliated with any market segment and selected by the other members of the governing body to serve three-year terms]. (g-1) The governor shall select a presiding officer of the governing body from among its members [of the governing body must be one of the members described by Subsection (g)(7)]. (g-2) Members of the governing body of an independent organization certified under this section serve staggered terms of four years, with four members' terms expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year. Not later than the 30th day after the date a member of the governing body's term expires, the governor shall appoint a replacement in the same manner as the original appointment. If a vacancy occurs on the governing body, the governor shall appoint a successor in the same manner as the original appointment to serve for the remainder of the unexpired term. The governor shall appoint the successor not later than the 30th day after the date the vacancy occurs. SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 1, 2021, the governor shall comply with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as amended by this Act, by appointing members to the governing body of an independent organization certified under Section 39.151, Utilities Code, by the Public Utility Commission of Texas before September 1, 2021. To establish staggered terms, the governor shall designate four initial appointees to serve terms expiring February 1, 2023, and four initial appointees to serve terms expiring February 1, 2025. (b) After September 1, 2022, the Public Utility Commission of Texas may decertify an independent organization whose governing body does not comply with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as amended by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.