Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1696 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/13/2021

                    By: Paxton S.B. No. 1696
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 13, 2021,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0, one
 present not voting; April 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing a system for the sharing of information
 regarding cyber attacks or other cybersecurity incidents occurring
 in schools in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.175, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsections (g), (h), and (i) to
 read as follows:
 (e)  The district's cybersecurity coordinator shall report
 to the agency or, if applicable, the entity that administers the
 system established under Subsection (g) any cyber attack or other
 cybersecurity incident against the district cyberinfrastructure
 that constitutes a breach of system security as soon as practicable
 after the discovery of the attack or incident.
 (g)  The agency, in coordination with the Department of
 Information Resources, shall establish and maintain a system to
 coordinate the anonymous sharing of information concerning cyber
 attacks or other cybersecurity incidents between public and private
 schools and the state.  The system must:
 (1)  include each report made under Subsection (e);
 (2)  provide for reports made under Subsection (e) to
 be shared between schools in as close to real time as possible; and
 (3)  preserve a reporting school's anonymity by
 preventing the disclosure through the system of the name of the
 school at which an attack or incident occurred.
 (h)  In establishing the system under Subsection (g), the
 agency may:
 (1)  contract with a qualified third party to
 administer the system; and
 (2)  allow open-enrollment charter schools and private
 schools in this state to report and receive information through the
 system.
 (i)  The commissioner shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *