Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1764 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/14/2021

                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 1764
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 14, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment of delinquent ad valorem taxes on property
 subject to a tax sale.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 31.06, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Section 31.061, taxes are payable
 only as provided by this section. Except as provided by Subsection
 (e), a [A] collector shall accept United States currency or a check
 or money order in payment of taxes and shall accept payment by
 credit card or electronic funds transfer.
 (e)  A collector may adopt a written policy that requires
 payment of delinquent taxes, penalties, interest, and costs and
 expenses recoverable under Section 33.48 only with United States
 currency, a cashier's check, a certified check, or an electronic
 funds transfer if the payment relates to:
 (1)  personal property seized under Subchapter B,
 Chapter 33;
 (2)  property subject to an order of sale under
 Subchapter C, Chapter 33; or
 (3)  real property seized under Subchapter E, Chapter
 33.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *