Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1797 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2021

                    By: West S.B. No. 1797
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 22, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1797 By:  Blanco


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to including work colleges in the TexShare library
 consortium.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 441.221(2), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (2)  "Institution of higher education" includes:
 (A)  an institution of higher education and [as
 defined by Section 61.003, Education Code, and] a private or
 independent institution of higher education, as those terms are
 defined by Section 61.003, Education Code; and
 (B)  a work college, as defined by 20 U.S.C.
 Section 1087-58.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *