Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1827 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/21/2021

                    By: Huffman, Nelson S.B. No. 1827
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 21, 2021,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 13, Nays 0; April 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1827 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the opioid abatement account and to a
 statewide opioid settlement agreement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 403, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 403.1044 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.1044.  OPIOID ABATEMENT ACCOUNT. (a)  The opioid
 abatement account is a dedicated account in the general revenue
 fund.
 (b)  The account is composed of:
 (1)  money received by the state from any source
 resulting directly or indirectly from an action by the state
 against an opioid manufacturer, an opioid distributor, or another
 person in the opioid industry relating to a violation of state or
 federal law on the manufacture, marketing, distribution, or sale of
 opioids, other than money distributed to a political subdivision of
 the state in accordance with the terms of a settlement agreement or
 judgment;
 (2)  money appropriated or transferred to the account
 by the legislature;
 (3)  gifts and grants contributed to the account; and
 (4)  earnings on the principal of the account.
 (c)  Money in the account may be appropriated only to a state
 agency for the abatement of opioid-related harms.
 (d)  A state agency may use money appropriated to the agency
 from the account only to:
 (1)  prevent opioid use disorder through
 evidence-based education and prevention, such as school-based
 prevention, early intervention, or health care services or programs
 intended to reduce the risk of opioid use by school-age children;
 (2)  support efforts to prevent or reduce deaths from
 opioid overdoses or other opioid-related harms, including through
 increasing the availability or distribution of naloxone or other
 opioid antagonists for use by health care providers, first
 responders, persons experiencing an opioid overdose, families,
 schools, community-based service providers, social workers, or
 other members of the public;
 (3)  create and provide training on the treatment of
 opioid addiction, including the treatment of opioid dependence with
 each medication approved for that purpose by the United States Food
 and Drug Administration, medical detoxification, relapse
 prevention, patient assessment, individual treatment planning,
 counseling, recovery supports, diversion control, and other best
 practices;
 (4)  provide opioid use disorder treatment for youths
 and adults, with an emphasis on programs that provide a continuum of
 care that includes screening and assessment for opioid use disorder
 and co-occurring behavioral health disorders, early intervention,
 contingency management, cognitive behavioral therapy, case
 management, relapse management, counseling services, and
 medication-assisted treatments;
 (5)  provide patients suffering from opioid dependence
 with access to all medications approved by the United States Food
 and Drug Administration for the treatment of opioid dependence and
 relapse prevention following opioid detoxification, including
 opioid agonists, partial agonists, and antagonists;
 (6)  support efforts to reduce the abuse or misuse of
 addictive prescription medications, including tools used to give
 health care providers information needed to protect the public from
 the harm caused by improper use of those medications;
 (7)  support treatment alternatives that provide both
 psychosocial support and medication-assisted treatments in areas
 with geographical or transportation-related challenges, including
 providing access to mobile health services and telemedicine,
 particularly in rural areas; or
 (8)  further any other purpose related to opioid
 abatement authorized by appropriation.
 SECTION 2.  The attorney general is required to implement a
 provision of this Act only if the legislature appropriates money
 specifically for that purpose. If the legislature does not
 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the attorney
 general may, but is not required to, implement a provision of this
 Act using other appropriations available for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *