Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1829 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2021

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1829
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 20, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1829 By:  Buckingham


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to maintaining an electronic directory of contact
 information for Medicaid managed care program recipients.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 533, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 533.00751 to read as follows:
 Sec. 533.00751.  RECIPIENT DIRECTORY. The commission shall
 in accordance with a single source of truth design:
 (1)  maintain an accurate electronic directory of
 contact information for each recipient enrolled in a managed care
 plan offered by a Medicaid managed care organization under this
 chapter, including, to the extent feasible, each recipient's:
 (A)  home, work, and mobile telephone numbers;
 (B)  e-mail address; and
 (C)  home and work addresses; and
 (2)  ensure that each Medicaid managed care
 organization and enrollment broker participating in the Medicaid
 managed care program update the electronic directory required under
 Subdivision (1) in real time.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The Health and Human Services Commission
 shall, in a contract between the commission and a managed care
 organization under Chapter 533, Government Code, that is entered
 into or renewed on or after the effective date of this Act, require
 that the managed care organization comply with Section 533.00751,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  The Health and Human Services Commission shall seek to
 amend contracts entered into with managed care organizations under
 Chapter 533, Government Code, before the effective date of this Act
 to require those managed care organizations to comply with Section
 533.00751, Government Code, as added by this Act. To the extent of
 a conflict between that section and a provision of a contract with a
 managed care organization entered into before the effective date of
 this Act, the contract provision prevails.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *