87R7782 JG-D By: Eckhardt S.B. No. 1833 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to post-release housing for inmates released on parole or to mandatory supervision. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 508.157, Government Code, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (f) and (g) to read as follows: (b) The [If the department does not operate or contract for the operation of a residential correctional facility in the county of legal residence of an inmate or releasee, the] department may issue, for an inmate described by Subsection (a) or for a releasee, payment for the cost of temporary post-release housing that: (1) meets any conditions or requirements imposed by a parole panel; (2) meets or exceeds the standards developed by the Reentry Housing Task Force; and (3) is located in the county of legal residence of the inmate or releasee[; and [(3) except as provided by Subsection (e-1), is in a structure that existed on June 1, 2009, as a multifamily residence or as a motel to which Section 156.001, Tax Code, applies]. (f) The department shall actively seek grants from any source for the purpose of expanding the use of temporary post-release housing payments under Subsection (b) as an alternative to housing an inmate described by Subsection (a) or a releasee in a residential correctional facility. Notwithstanding Subsection (d), the department may issue payments under Subsection (b) out of grant funds received for that purpose. (g) The department shall: (1) prioritize the use of temporary post-release housing payments under Subsection (b) to reduce the average number of days an inmate described by Subsection (a) or a releasee is housed in a residential correctional facility; and (2) reduce the number of inmates or releasees housed in a residential correctional facility if the department determines that the issuance of payments under Subsection (b) increases the availability of temporary post-release housing that meets or exceeds the standards described by Subsection (b)(2). SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 508, Government Code, is amended by adding Sections 508.158 and 508.159 to read as follows: Sec. 508.158. POST-RELEASE HOUSING PLANNING PROCEDURE AND REPORT. (a) In this section, "residential correctional facility" has the meaning assigned by Section 508.157. (b) The department shall implement a post-release housing planning procedure for releasees that includes the early identification and assessment of inmates who do not have an established plan for housing following release on parole or to mandatory supervision. (c) In implementing the post-release housing planning procedure, the department shall create a needs assessment to identify: (1) inmates who would benefit from the use of temporary post-release housing payments under Section 508.157(b); (2) inmates who require more intensive planning for post-release housing; and (3) the particular housing needs of inmates due to a disability or an inmate's familial circumstances. (d) Not later than February 1 of each year, the department shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and each standing committee of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over the department a report that includes the following information for the preceding year: (1) the number of inmates described by Subsection (b) and the department's efforts to find post-release housing for those inmates; (2) the department's efforts to reduce the length of time between an inmate's parole approval and the release of the inmate on parole for an inmate described by Subsection (b); (3) the department's efforts to expand post-release housing options in local communities, including post-release housing that meets or exceeds the standards developed by the Reentry Housing Task Force; (4) the average number of days a releasee is housed in a residential correctional facility; and (5) the number of releasees who absconded from a residential correctional facility. Sec. 508.159. REENTRY HOUSING TASK FORCE; BIENNIAL REPORTS. (a) In this section, "task force" means the Reentry Housing Task Force established under this section. (b) The Reentry Housing Task Force is established and is composed of members appointed by the executive director. The task force must include: (1) at least one representative from each of the following entities: (A) the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs; (B) the Texas Veterans Commission; (C) a nonprofit organization that is engaged in creating recovery housing options in this state; (D) a nonprofit organization that advocates for persons who are required to register as a sex offender under Chapter 62, Code of Criminal Procedure; (E) a nonprofit organization for family members of persons who are incarcerated; and (F) a nonprofit organization that operates a Continuum of Care program funded wholly or partly by the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development; (2) two or more individuals who are health care professionals, one of whom must be a certified emergency medical technician; and (3) one individual who specializes in the reentry of female releasees. (c) The executive director shall designate a member of the task force as the presiding officer. (d) The task force shall meet every other month or at the call of the presiding officer. (e) A member of the task force is not entitled to compensation for service on the task force but is entitled to reimbursement for travel expenses incurred by the member while conducting the business of the task force as provided by the General Appropriations Act. (f) The task force shall: (1) evaluate, on an ongoing basis, strategies for improving post-release housing for releasees, including: (A) methods to provide housing options for releasees that are in addition to housing provided by residential correctional facilities, as that term is defined by Section 508.157; and (B) the feasibility of expanding the use of housing vouchers or other payments for the post-release housing of releasees; (2) develop and update as necessary standards for post-release housing for releasees that promote: (A) the successful reintegration of releasees into the community; and (B) community health and safety; (3) develop and update as necessary a post-release housing planning procedure for releasees that the department may implement that includes the early identification and assessment of inmates who do not have an established plan for housing following release on parole or to mandatory supervision; and (4) develop and update as necessary recommendations to address the risk of homelessness for releasees who are unable to find suitable post-release housing. (g) The task force and the department shall evaluate, on an ongoing basis, the implementation of post-release housing initiatives and planning procedures under this subchapter. (h) Not later than June 1 of each even-numbered year, the task force shall prepare and submit to the department a written report on the task force's findings under this section, including standards, procedures, and recommendations developed under Subsection (f) and any updates to those standards, procedures, and recommendations. (i) Not later than June 30 of each even-numbered year, the department shall compile the results of the evaluations conducted under Subsection (g) and the findings submitted under Subsection (h) and shall prepare and submit to the legislature a written report on the evaluation results and findings. The report must include any proposed legislative recommendations. (j) Chapter 2110 does not apply to the size, composition, or duration of the task force or to the designation of the task force's presiding officer. SECTION 3. Section 508.157(e-1), Government Code, is repealed. SECTION 4. Notwithstanding the requirements of Section 508.157(b)(2), Government Code, as amended by this Act, until January 1, 2023, the Texas Department of Criminal Justice may continue to make payments for the cost of temporary post-release housing under the requirements of Section 508.157(b), Government Code, that existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and those requirements are continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 5. Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall implement the post-release housing planning procedure and assessment required by Section 508.158, Government Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 6. Not later than November 1, 2021, the executive director of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall appoint the members to the Reentry Housing Task Force as required by Section 508.159, Government Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.