Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1854 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/29/2021

                    By: Powell S.B. No. 1854
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 29, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; April 29, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an appeal through binding arbitration of an appraisal
 review board order determining a protest concerning a residence
 homestead for which the property owner has elected to defer the
 collection of ad valorem taxes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41A.10, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (a)  The pendency of an appeal under this chapter does not
 affect the delinquency date for the taxes on the property subject to
 the appeal. Except for a property owner who has elected to defer
 the collection of taxes under Section 33.06 or 33.065 on the
 property subject to the appeal and for which the deferral is still
 in effect, a [A] property owner who appeals an appraisal review
 board order under this chapter shall pay taxes on the property
 subject to the appeal in an amount equal to the amount of taxes due
 on the portion of the taxable value of the property that is not in
 dispute. If the final determination of an appeal under this chapter
 decreases the property owner's tax liability to less than the
 amount of taxes paid, the taxing unit shall refund to the property
 owner the difference between the amount of taxes paid and the amount
 of taxes for which the property owner is liable.
 (c)  For the purposes of Subsection (b) of this section,
 taxes are not considered delinquent on property subject to an
 appeal if the property owner has elected to defer the collection of
 taxes on the property under Section 33.06 or 33.065 and the deferral
 is still in effect.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a request for binding arbitration under Chapter 41A, Tax Code, that
 is filed on or after the effective date of this Act. A request for
 binding arbitration under Chapter 41A, Tax Code, that is filed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the request is filed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *