Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1856 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2021

                    By: Powell S.B. No. 1856
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain vocational nursing students providing
 essential services during a declared state of disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 242, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter T to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER T.  CERTAIN VOCATIONAL NURSING STUDENTS PROVIDING
 ESSENTIAL SERVICES
 Sec. 242.951.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Disaster" has the meaning assigned by Section
 418.004, Government Code.
 (2)  "Governmental entity" means:
 (A)  this state;
 (B)  a board, commission, council, department, or
 other agency in the executive branch of state government that is
 created by the state constitution or a statute, including an
 institution of higher education as defined by Section 61.003,
 Education Code;
 (C)  the legislature or a legislative agency;
 (D)  a state judicial agency or the State Bar of
 Texas;
 (E)  a political subdivision of this state,
 including a county, municipality, or special district or authority;
 or
 (F)  an officer, employee, or agent of an entity
 described by Paragraphs (A) through (E).
 Sec. 242.952.  APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies only
 to a student who is:
 (1)  enrolled in an accredited school or program that
 is preparing the student for licensure as a licensed vocational
 nurse; and
 (2)  participating in a clinical program at a facility
 licensed under this chapter.
 Sec. 242.953.  ESSENTIAL SERVICE. (a)  Notwithstanding any
 other law, the services provided by a student to whom this
 subchapter applies in a facility licensed under this chapter are
 essential services at all times in this state, including during a
 declared state of disaster.
 (b)  A governmental entity may not, at any time, including
 during a declared state of disaster, prohibit a student to whom this
 subchapter applies from providing essential services.
 (c)  A facility licensed under this chapter may require a
 student to comply with the facility's policies regarding health
 screenings or the use of personal protective equipment.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *