Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1890 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/13/2021

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 1890
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture & Rural
 Affairs; April 13, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1890 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of uniform grant and contract
 management standards to certain Texas Water Development Board
 programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 15.008, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 15.008.  GRANT STANDARDS. The law regarding uniform
 grant [grants] and contract management, Chapter 783, Government
 Code, does not apply to a contract under Subchapter F, H, I, K, or P,
 or to a contract relating to an economically distressed area or
 nonborder colonia under Subchapter C.
 SECTION 2.  Section 16.458, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 16.458.  APPLICABLE LAW. (a) Subchapter E, Chapter 17,
 applies to financial assistance made available from the resiliency
 fund, except that the board may execute contracts as necessary to
 evidence grant agreements.
 (b)  The law regarding uniform grant and contract
 management, Chapter 783, Government Code, does not apply to a
 contract for financial assistance made available from the
 resiliency fund.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter J, Chapter 17, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 17.913 to read as follows:
 Sec. 17.913.  GRANT STANDARDS. The law regarding uniform
 grant and contract management, Chapter 783, Government Code, does
 not apply to a contract under this subchapter.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a contract entered into on or after the effective date of this Act.
 A contract entered into before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date
 of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *