Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1895 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2021

                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 1895
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a Texas Medical Board complaint for a violation
 described by Section 22.011(b)(12), Penal Code.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 154.051, Occupations Code, is amended as
 follows by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (d-1):
 (d)  The board may not consider or act on a complaint
 involving care provided more than seven years before the date on
 which the complaint is received by the board unless the care was
 provided to a minor or the care involves a complaint under
 Subsection (d-1).  If the care was provided to a minor, the board
 may not consider or act on a complaint involving the care after the
 later of:
 (1)  the date the minor is 21 years of age; or
 (2)  the seventh anniversary of the date of the care.
 (d-1)  The board may not consider or act on a complaint
 involving an alleged violation of Section 22.011(b)(12), Penal
 Code, that occurred more than seven years before the date on which
 the complaint is received by the board or more than 2 years from the
 date the complainant knew or should have known of the facts giving
 rise to the complaint, whichever is later.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to a
 complaint under Chapter 154, Occupations Code, initiated on or
 after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *