Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1900 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2021

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1900
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; March 26, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 8, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulatory authority of the savings and mortgage
 lending commissioner; authorizing fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 92.554(a), Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  On receipt of an application, the commissioner shall
 submit to the Texas Register for publication in the next issue after
 the date the application is received or publish in a newspaper of
 general circulation that is printed in English in the county in
 which the savings bank is to have the savings bank's principal
 office:
 (1)  notice of the application;
 (2)  the date the application was filed; and
 (3)  the identity of each party to the application.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 96, Finance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 96.0551 to read as follows:
 Sec. 96.0551.  REGULATION AND EXAMINATION OF CERTAIN RELATED
 ENTITIES. (a) In this section, "state savings bank" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 31.002.
 (b)  The commissioner may regulate and examine, to the same
 extent as if the services or activities were performed by a state
 savings bank on its own premises:
 (1)  the activities of a state savings bank affiliate;
 and
 (2)  the services or activities of a third-party
 service provider that a state savings bank or state savings bank
 affiliate has contracted for or otherwise arranged to be performed
 on behalf of the state savings bank or state savings bank affiliate.
 (c)  The commissioner may collect a fee from an examined
 third-party service provider or affiliate in connection with each
 examination to cover the cost of the examination or may collect that
 fee from the state savings banks that use the examined third-party
 service provider.
 (d)  For purposes of this section, a state savings bank
 affiliate does not include a company in which ownership or
 membership is limited to individuals and conditioned by law on the
 existence and maintenance of professional licensing.
 (e)  To promote regulatory efficiency, if, in the preceding
 24 months, a third-party service provider or affiliate has been
 examined by a federal or state financial services regulatory agency
 or by a member agency of the Federal Financial Institutions
 Examination Council, or its successor agency, the commissioner may
 accept the results of that examination instead of conducting the
 commissioner's own examination of the third-party service provider
 or affiliate. Nothing in this subsection shall be construed as
 limiting or restricting the commissioner from participating in an
 examination of a third-party service provider or affiliate
 conducted by a federal or state financial services regulatory
 agency or by a member agency of the Federal Financial Institutions
 Examination Council, or its successor agency.
 (f)  A third-party service provider that refuses to submit to
 examination or to pay an assessed fee for examination under this
 section is subject to an enforcement action under Chapter 96. With
 respect to a third-party service provider's refusal to submit to
 examination, the commissioner may notify all state savings banks of
 the refusal and warn that continued use of the third-party service
 provider may constitute an unsafe and unsound banking practice.
 SECTION 3.  Section 97.006, Finance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (f), (g), and (h) to read as follows:
 (f)  The commissioner may:
 (1)  examine a holding company that controls a state
 savings bank to the same extent as if the holding company were a
 state savings bank; and
 (2)  bring an enforcement action under Chapter 96
 against a holding company described by Subdivision (1) or other
 person that violates or participates in a violation of this
 subtitle, an agreement filed with the commissioner under this
 chapter, or a rule adopted by the finance commission or order issued
 by the commissioner under this subtitle, as if the holding company
 were a state savings bank.
 (g)  The grounds, procedures, and effects of an enforcement
 action brought under Subsection (f) apply to a holding company, an
 officer, director, or employee of a holding company, or a
 controlling shareholder or other person participating in the
 affairs of a holding company in the same manner as the grounds,
 procedures, and effects apply to a state savings bank, an officer,
 director, or employee of a state savings bank, or a controlling
 shareholder or other person participating in the affairs of a state
 savings bank.
 (h)  A state savings bank that is controlled by a holding
 company that is not a Texas holding company shall be subject to all
 laws of this state that are applicable to state savings banks that
 are controlled by Texas holding companies.
 SECTION 4.  Section 156.2041(a), Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  To be issued a mortgage company license, an applicant
 must:
 (1)  submit a completed application together with the
 payment of applicable fees through the Nationwide Mortgage
 Licensing System and Registry;
 (2)  designate control persons for the mortgage company
 through the Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System and Registry;
 (3)  designate an individual licensed as a residential
 mortgage loan originator under Chapter 157 as the company's
 qualifying individual;
 (4)  submit a completed branch application through the
 Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System and Registry for each branch
 office that engages in residential mortgage loan activity on
 residential real estate located in this state;
 (5)  not be in violation of this chapter, a rule adopted
 under this chapter, or any order previously issued by the
 commissioner to the applicant;
 (6)  have the company name or assumed name properly
 filed with either the secretary of state or with the appropriate
 county clerk's office; and
 (7)  [maintain a physical office in this state; and
 [(8)]  provide financial statements and any other
 information required by the commissioner.
 SECTION 5.  Section 156.2042(a), Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  To be issued a credit union subsidiary organization
 license, an applicant must:
 (1)  submit a completed application together with the
 payment of applicable fees through the Nationwide Mortgage
 Licensing System and Registry;
 (2)  designate control persons for the organization
 through the Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System and Registry;
 (3)  designate an individual licensed as a residential
 mortgage loan originator under Chapter 157 as the company's
 qualifying individual;
 (4)  submit a completed branch application through the
 Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System and Registry for each branch
 office that engages in residential mortgage loan activity on
 residential real estate located in this state; and
 (5)  not be in violation of this chapter, a rule adopted
 under this chapter, or any order previously issued by the
 commissioner to the applicant[; and
 [(6)  maintain a physical office in this state].
 SECTION 6.  Section 156.501(c), Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  Amounts in the recovery fund may be invested and
 reinvested in accordance with Chapter 2256, Government Code, and
 under the prudent person standard described by Section 11b, Article
 VII, Texas Constitution [in the same manner as funds of the
 Employees Retirement System of Texas], and the interest from these
 investments shall be deposited to the credit of the fund. An
 investment may not be made under this subsection if the investment
 will impair the necessary liquidity required to satisfy judgment
 payments awarded under this subchapter.
 SECTION 7.  The following provisions of the Finance Code are
 repealed:
 (1)  Sections 156.212(a) and (a-1);
 (2)  Sections 156.501(d) and (f); and
 (3)  Section 156.502(b).
 SECTION 8.  Section 92.554(a), Finance Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to an application filed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An application filed before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the application was filed, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 9.  Section 156.501(c), Finance Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to an investment made on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An investment made before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 investment was made, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *