Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1915 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/12/2021

                    87R1420 JG-D
 By: Blanco S.B. No. 1915


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of recovery community organization
 peer-to-peer services under Medicaid.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.09991 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.09991.  RECOVERY COMMUNITY ORGANIZATIONS. (a) In
 this section, "recovery community organization" means a nonprofit
 organization that:
 (1)  mobilizes resources inside and outside of a local
 community to increase the prevalence and quality of long-term
 recovery for individuals with a substance use disorder and their
 family members; and
 (2)  is at least partly governed by individuals
 recovering from a substance use disorder or their family members.
 (b)  The executive commissioner, with input from the work
 group established under Subsection (c), shall adopt rules to
 provide Medicaid reimbursement for peer-to-peer services provided
 by recovery community organizations, which must include:
 (1)  rules that establish training requirements for
 recovery community organization peer-to-peer service providers;
 (2)  rules that establish certification and
 supervision requirements for recovery community organizations;
 (3)  rules that define the scope of peer-to-peer
 services that recovery community organizations may provide;
 (4)  rules that distinguish peer-to-peer services
 provided by recovery community organizations from other services
 that a person must hold a license to provide; and
 (5)  any other rules necessary to protect the health
 and safety of individuals receiving services provided by recovery
 community organizations.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall establish a work group
 to provide input for the adoption of rules under Subsection (b).
 The work group is composed of at least 9 but not more than 13 members
 with expertise in substance use disorder recovery or recovery
 community organizations. The executive commissioner shall ensure
 that at least half of the work group members are from rural
 communities in this state.
 (d)  The executive commissioner shall appoint one work group
 member to serve as presiding officer.
 (e)  The work group is automatically abolished on the
 adoption of rules under Subsection (b).
 (f)  Subsections (c), (d), and (e) and this subsection expire
 September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  Effective January 1, 2023, Section 32.024, Human
 Resources Code, is amended by adding Subsection (pp) to read as
 follows:
 (pp)  The commission in its rules and standards governing the
 scope of services provided under the medical assistance program
 shall include peer-to-peer services provided by recovery community
 organizations as defined by Section 531.09991, Government Code, to
 the extent permitted by federal law.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 31, 2021, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 establish the work group required by Section 531.09991, Government
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than December 31, 2022, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt the rules required by Section 531.09991, Government Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 6.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.