Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1963 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2021

                    By: West S.B. No. 1963
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; April 1, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 19, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 19, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1963 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a transferability report card for certain public
 institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.96854 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.96854.  TRANSFERABILITY REPORT CARD. (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 (2)  "General academic teaching institution" and
 "public state college" have the meanings assigned by Section
 61.003.
 (b)  Not later than March 1 of each year, a general academic
 teaching institution other than a public state college shall post
 on the institution's Internet website a transferability report card
 that indicates for the preceding academic year:
 (1)  the total number of semester credit hours or the
 equivalent for which undergraduate students transferring to the
 institution applied for transfer credit; and
 (2)  the percentage of the semester credit hours or the
 equivalent described by Subdivision (1) for which students received
 transfer credit.
 (c)  The coordinating board, in consultation with general
 academic teaching institutions to which Subsection (b) applies,
 shall develop a model transferability report card for use under
 Subsection (b).
 (d)  Not later than April 1 of each year, the coordinating
 board shall post on the coordinating board's Internet website a
 list stating the transferability percentage described by
 Subsection (b)(2) of each general academic teaching institution
 other than a public state college.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
 develop the model transferability report card required under
 Section 51.96854(c), Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Not later than March 1, 2023, each public
 institution of higher education to which Section 51.96854(b),
 Education Code, as added by this Act, applies shall post on the
 institution's Internet website the initial transferability report
 card required under that subsection.
 (b)  Not later than April 1, 2023, the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board shall post on the board's Internet website the
 initial list required under Section 51.96854(d), Education Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *