Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB199 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2021

                    S.B. No. 199


 AN ACT
 relating to automated external defibrillators.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 779.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 779.003.  ACQUISITION, MAINTENANCE, AND INSPECTION OF
 AUTOMATED EXTERNAL DEFIBRILLATOR. A person or entity that owns or
 leases an automated external defibrillator shall:
 (1)  maintain and test the automated external
 defibrillator according to the manufacturer's guidelines; and
 (2)  conduct a monthly inspection to verify the
 automated external defibrillator:
 (A)  is placed at its designated location;
 (B)  reasonably appears to be ready for use; and
 (C)  does not reasonably appear to be damaged in a
 manner that could prevent operation.
 SECTION 2.  Section 779.006, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 779.006.  LIABILITY EXEMPTION.  (a)  Unless the conduct
 is wilfully or wantonly negligent, a [The prescribing] physician
 who prescribes or is otherwise involved in [authorizes] the
 acquisition of an automated external defibrillator and any [in
 accordance with this chapter, a] person or entity that provides
 [approved] training in the use of an automated external
 defibrillator [in accordance with this chapter, and the person or
 entity that acquires the automated external defibrillator and meets
 the requirements of this chapter] are not liable for civil damages
 related to:
 (1)  the [for such] prescription, [training, or]
 acquisition, or training in the use of the automated external
 defibrillator; or
 (2)  any use or attempted use of or the failure to use
 the automated external defibrillator [unless the conduct is
 wilfully or wantonly negligent].
 (b)  Any person or entity that acquires an automated external
 defibrillator and any person or entity that owns, occupies,
 manages, or is otherwise responsible for the designated location
 where the automated external defibrillator is placed are not liable
 for civil damages related to the use or attempted use of or the
 failure to use the automated external defibrillator unless the
 conduct is wilfully or wantonly negligent [and negligently fails to
 comply with the requirements of this chapter is liable for civil
 damages caused by such negligence].
 (c)  The immunity provided by this section is in addition to
 any other immunity or limitations of liability provided by other
 law.
 (d)  The immunity described by this section applies
 regardless of whether the person who uses, attempts to use, or fails
 to use the automated external defibrillator received training in
 the use of an automated external defibrillator.
 SECTION 3.  Section 21.0541, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 21.0541.  CONTINUING EDUCATION CREDIT FOR INSTRUCTION
 RELATED TO USE OF AUTOMATED EXTERNAL DEFIBRILLATOR. The board
 shall adopt rules allowing an educator to receive credit towards
 the educator's continuing education requirements for completion of
 an instructional course on the use of an automated external
 defibrillator that meets any [the] guidelines for automated
 external defibrillator training approved by the board [under
 Section 779.002, Health and Safety Code].
 SECTION 4.  The following provisions are repealed:
 (1)  Section 22.902(b), Education Code; and
 (2)  Section 779.002, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 199 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 199 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 131,
 Nays 14, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor