Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2016 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2021

                    S.B. No. 2016


 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of certain provisions mandating the
 provision by certain health benefit plans of health benefits
 requiring cost defrayal by this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 1425, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter A, and a heading is added to that subchapter to
 read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER A.  EXCEPTED BENEFITS
 SECTION 2.  Sections 1425.001 and 1425.002, Insurance Code,
 are transferred to Subchapter A, Chapter 1425, Insurance Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 1425, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter B to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER B.  BENEFITS REQUIRING DEFRAYAL
 Sec. 1425.051.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "qualified
 health plan" has the meaning assigned by 45 C.F.R. Section 155.20.
 Sec. 1425.052.  EXEMPTION FROM SUBTITLE FOR BENEFITS
 REQUIRING DEFRAYAL. (a)  A provision of this subtitle that is
 enacted on or after January 1, 2012, does not apply to a qualified
 health plan if a determination is made under 45 C.F.R. Section
 155.170 that:
 (1)  the provision requires the qualified health plan
 to offer benefits in addition to the essential health benefits
 required under 42 U.S.C. Section 18022(b); and
 (2)  this state must make payments to defray the cost of
 the additional benefits mandated by the provision.
 (b)  If a determination described by Subsection (a) is made
 as to a qualified health plan, the provision to which the
 determination relates does not apply to a non-qualified health plan
 if the non-qualified health plan is offered in the same market as
 the qualified health plan.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2016 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2016 passed the House on
 May 26, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 9, two present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor