Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2037 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/13/2021

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 2037
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; April 1, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 May 13, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of exploitation for purposes of
 investigating reports of exploitation against certain elderly
 persons and persons with disabilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 48.251(b), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The executive commissioner by rule shall adopt
 definitions of "abuse," "neglect," "exploitation," and "an
 individual receiving services" for purposes of this subchapter and
 investigations conducted under this subchapter. The definition of
 "exploitation" adopted by the executive commissioner under this
 subsection may not exclude from the definition as an act of
 exploitation the provision of a monetary or property loan made to a
 provider by an individual receiving services from that provider.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *