Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2049 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2021

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 2049
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; April 1, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to guardians ad litem for children who are in the juvenile
 justice system and the child protective services system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.11, Family Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  The juvenile court may appoint the guardian ad litem
 appointed under Chapter 107 for a child in a suit affecting the
 parent-child relationship filed by the Department of Family and
 Protective Services to serve as the guardian ad litem for the child
 in a proceeding held under this title.
 (e)  A guardian ad litem may not investigate any charges
 involving the child that are pending with the juvenile court.
 SECTION 2.  Section 54.01(c), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  At the detention hearing, the court may consider written
 reports from probation officers, professional court employees,
 guardians ad litem appointed under Section 51.11(d), or
 professional consultants in addition to the testimony of witnesses.
 Prior to the detention hearing, the court shall provide the
 attorney for the child with access to all written matter to be
 considered by the court in making the detention decision. The court
 may order counsel not to reveal items to the child or his parent,
 guardian, or guardian ad litem if such disclosure would materially
 harm the treatment and rehabilitation of the child or would
 substantially decrease the likelihood of receiving information
 from the same or similar sources in the future.
 SECTION 3.  Section 54.02(e), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (e)  At the transfer hearing the court may consider written
 reports from probation officers, professional court employees,
 guardians ad litem appointed under Section 51.11(d), or
 professional consultants in addition to the testimony of witnesses.
 At least five days prior to the transfer hearing, the court shall
 provide the attorney for the child and the prosecuting attorney
 with access to all written matter to be considered by the court in
 making the transfer decision. The court may order counsel not to
 reveal items to the child or the child's parent, guardian, or
 guardian ad litem if such disclosure would materially harm the
 treatment and rehabilitation of the child or would substantially
 decrease the likelihood of receiving information from the same or
 similar sources in the future.
 SECTION 4.  Section 54.04(b), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  At the disposition hearing, the juvenile court,
 notwithstanding the Texas Rules of Evidence or Chapter 37, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, may consider written reports from probation
 officers, professional court employees, guardians ad litem
 appointed under Section 51.11(d), or professional consultants in
 addition to the testimony of witnesses. On or before the second day
 before the date of the disposition hearing, the court shall provide
 the attorney for the child and the prosecuting attorney with access
 to all written matter to be considered by the court in disposition.
 The court may order counsel not to reveal items to the child or the
 child's parent, guardian, or guardian ad litem if such disclosure
 would materially harm the treatment and rehabilitation of the child
 or would substantially decrease the likelihood of receiving
 information from the same or similar sources in the future.
 SECTION 5.  Section 54.05(e), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (e)  After the hearing on the merits or facts, the court may
 consider written reports from probation officers, professional
 court employees, guardians ad litem appointed under Section
 51.11(d), or professional consultants in addition to the testimony
 of other witnesses. On or before the second day before the date of
 the hearing to modify disposition, the court shall provide the
 attorney for the child and the prosecuting attorney with access to
 all written matter to be considered by the court in deciding whether
 to modify disposition. The court may order counsel not to reveal
 items to the child or his parent, guardian, or guardian ad litem if
 such disclosure would materially harm the treatment and
 rehabilitation of the child or would substantially decrease the
 likelihood of receiving information from the same or similar
 sources in the future.
 SECTION 6.  Section 54.11(d), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  At a hearing under this section the court may consider
 written reports and supporting documents from probation officers,
 professional court employees, guardians ad litem appointed under
 Section 51.11(d), professional consultants, employees of the Texas
 Juvenile Justice Department, or employees of a post-adjudication
 secure correctional facility in addition to the testimony of
 witnesses. On or before the fifth day before the date of the
 hearing, the court shall provide the attorney for the person to be
 transferred or released under supervision with access to all
 written matter to be considered by the court. All written matter is
 admissible in evidence at the hearing.
 SECTION 7.  Section 107.011, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows:
 (e)  The court may appoint the person appointed as guardian
 ad litem for the child under Section 51.11 to also serve as the
 guardian ad litem for the child under this section.
 (f)  Notwithstanding any other law, a guardian ad litem
 appointed under this section for a child may not investigate any
 pending criminal or juvenile charges involving the child.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *