Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2054 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2021

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 2054
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; April 1, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 23, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 23, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2054 By:  Alvarado


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment of fees and costs associated with driver
 education and safety courses and driver's license examinations for
 foster children or youth, former foster children or youth, and
 youth experiencing homelessness.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.168 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.168.  PAYMENT OF FEES FOR CERTAIN FOSTER AND
 HOMELESS CHILDREN AND YOUTHS. (a) Unless prohibited under Section
 521.4265(c), the Texas Workforce Commission shall on request pay
 the fees associated with meeting a requirement imposed under this
 subchapter or Chapter 1001, Education Code, for a person who is:
 (1)  eligible for a driver's license fee exemption
 under Section 521.1811; or
 (2)  younger than 26 years of age and:
 (A)  was in the managing conservatorship of the
 Department of Family and Protective Services on the day before the
 person's 18th birthday; or
 (B)  is a homeless child or youth as defined by 42
 U.S.C. Section 11434a.
 (b)  The Texas Workforce Commission by rule shall establish a
 process by which:
 (1)  a person described by Subsection (a) may apply to
 that commission for the payment of fees under this section; and
 (2)  that commission pays fees associated with meeting
 a requirement imposed under this subchapter or Chapter 1001,
 Education Code, to appropriate entities on behalf of the person
 described by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  Section 521.4265, Transportation Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsection
 (d) to read as follows:
 (b)  From the money in the identification fee exemption
 account the department shall:
 (1)  request that the comptroller transfer to the Texas
 Workforce Commission amounts sufficient to provide for the payment
 by the Texas Workforce Commission of fees to entities other than the
 department under Section 521.168;
 (2)  pay the department's costs associated with
 administering Subdivision (1); and
 (3)  for [For] each exemption granted under Section
 521.1015 or 521.1811, [the department shall] deposit to the credit
 of the Texas mobility fund an amount [from the identification fee
 exemption account under Subsection (a)] that is equal to the amount
 of the waived fee that would otherwise be deposited to the mobility
 fund.
 (c)  The department may not:
 (1)  request a transfer under Subsection (b)(1) or pay
 a cost under Subsection (b)(2) if the department determines in
 consultation with the Texas Workforce Commission that the balance
 of the account is insufficient; or
 (2)  grant an exemption under Section 521.1015 or
 521.1811 if money is not available in the identification fee
 exemption account to meet the requirements of Subsection (b)(3)
 [(b)].
 (d)  The department, in consultation with the Texas
 Workforce Commission, by rule shall establish a process by which
 transfers are made under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *