Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2099 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2021

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 2099
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2021; April 1, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 23, 2021, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 23, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2099 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to methods by which a claimant may check the status of a
 claim for unemployment compensation benefits filed with the Texas
 Workforce Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 208, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 208.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 208.005.  CLAIM STATUS INFORMATION. (a)  The
 commission shall ensure that a person who files a claim for benefits
 is able to check the status of the person's claim through one or
 more convenient telephonic or electronic methods.  Each method must
 provide the person with an option to submit the person's contact
 information to the commission and receive a return phone call or
 e-mail response from the commission within a reasonable time
 regarding the status of the person's claim.
 (b)  The commission shall include in a prominent location on
 the commission's Internet website detailed information regarding
 the methods available to a claimant for checking the status of a
 claim for benefits.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *