Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2181 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2021

                    S.B. No. 2181


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of hotel occupancy tax revenue by certain
 municipalities for certain projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 334.2515, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 334.2515.  APPLICATION. Except as provided by Sections
 [Section] 334.2516 and 334.2518, this subchapter does not apply to
 the financing of a venue project that is:
 (1)  an area described by Section 334.001(4)(C);
 (2)  an area or facility that is part of a municipal
 parks and recreation system as described by Section 334.001(4)(D);
 (3)  a project described by Section 334.001(4)(E),
 except for a project described by Section 334.001(4)(A); or
 (4)  a facility described by Section 334.001(4)(G).
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 334, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 334.2518 to read as follows:
 Sec. 334.2518.  USE OF REVENUE BY CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES FOR
 CERTAIN PARK FACILITIES. (a) This section applies only to a
 municipality that has a population of more than 1 million but less
 than 1.3 million.
 (b)  Subject to Subsection (c), a municipality to which this
 section applies may acquire, construct, and improve a venue project
 that is an amphitheater, arena, exhibit hall, music hall, or
 stadium located within a municipally owned park that is at least 100
 acres in size and all or part of which is designated as a national
 historic landmark district, if the applicable type of facility is
 specifically listed in the ballot proposition for a venue project
 for the expansion of an existing convention center facility that
 primarily hosts conventions and has at least one million square
 feet of meeting space.
 (c)  A municipality may not spend more than 20 percent of the
 revenue from the convention center facility expansion venue project
 described by Subsection (b) for costs related to an amphitheater,
 arena, exhibit hall, music hall, or stadium located within a
 municipally owned park.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2181 passed the Senate on
 May 12, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 3; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2181 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 106,
 Nays 41, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor