Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB220 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2021

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 220
 (In the Senate - Filed November 30, 2020; March 3, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 March 30, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 15,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice and reporting requirements for vendor rebates
 under a contract listed on a multiple award contract schedule.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2155.510, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  The comptroller shall notify a state agency purchasing a
 good or service through a contract listed on a schedule developed
 under this subchapter of the percentage used to calculate the
 rebate authorized under Subsection (a).
 (c)  If a purchase resulting in a rebate under this section
 is made in whole or in part with federal funds, the purchasing state
 agency [comptroller] shall ensure that, to the extent the purchase
 was made with federal funds, the appropriate portion of the rebate
 is reported to [the purchasing agency for reporting and
 reconciliation purposes with] the appropriate federal funding
 agency.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *