Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2232 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/05/2021

                    By: Hall S.B. No. 2232
 (In the Senate - Filed April 26, 2021; April 27, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; May 5, 2021,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 3; May 5, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2232 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the management of polling place locations during a
 continuous period for voting.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 41, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 41.0015 to read as follows:
 Sec. 41.0015.  ELECTION PERIOD. In this title, "election
 period" means the period beginning on the first day of early voting
 by personal appearance as described under Section 85.001 and ending
 when the polls close on election day.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 43, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 43.008 to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.008.  ADDITIONAL POLLING PLACES DURING ELECTION
 PERIOD. If the county clerk or commissioners court, as applicable,
 determines that more polling places are needed during the election
 period than the number initially opened, the county clerk or
 commissioners court may open more polling places, but may not, for
 any reason, close a polling place before the end of the election
 period.
 SECTION 3.  Section 61.002, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.002.  OPENING AND CLOSING POLLING PLACE FOR VOTING.
 (a) Immediately before opening the polls for voting on the first day
 of the election period, the presiding election judge shall confirm
 that each voting machine has any public counter reset to zero and
 shall print the tape:
 (1)  that shows the counter was set to zero; and
 (2)  that shows the summary for each candidate and
 measure on the ballot for each voting machine is set to zero.
 (b)  At the official time for opening the polls for voting,
 an election officer shall open the polling place entrance and admit
 the voters.
 (c)  Immediately after closing the polls for voting on the
 last day of the election period, the presiding election judge shall
 print the tape to show the summary for each candidate or ballot
 measure for each voting machine.
 (d)  The precinct election judge, and an election official
 aligned with a different political party, shall sign a tape printed
 under this section.
 (e)  In this section, "election period" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 41.0015.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 85.001(a) and (e), Election Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The period for early voting by personal appearance
 begins on the 14th [17th] day before election day and continues
 through the opening of the polls on [the fourth day before] election
 day, except as otherwise provided by this section.
 (e)  For an election held on the uniform election date in May
 and any resulting runoff election, the period for early voting by
 personal appearance begins on the 10th [12th] day before election
 day and continues through the opening of the polls on [the fourth
 day before] election day.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter C, Chapter 125, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 125.0635 to read as follows:
 Sec. 125.0635.  SECURING EQUIPMENT ON FAILURE OF EQUIPMENT.
 (a) In this section, "election period" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 41.0015.
 (b)  If a piece of electronic voting machine equipment fails
 and is taken out of service during the election period, the
 equipment and any associated memory card must be securely isolated
 until the end of the election period.
 SECTION 6.  (a) The secretary of state shall conduct a study
 regarding the practical effects of eliminating the gap between the
 early voting period and election day.
 (b)  The secretary of state shall, not later than September
 1, 2022, submit a report on the secretary's findings to the
 legislature.
 (c)  The study must include information on how other states
 conduct the voting period, the implications of the use of paper
 ballots, and recommendations for statutory changes.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *