Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB224 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/22/2021

                    By: Perry, Menéndez, West S.B. No. 224
 (In the Senate - Filed December 2, 2020; March 3, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 March 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; March 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to simplified certification and recertification
 requirements for certain persons under the supplemental nutrition
 assistance program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.015(a), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In administering the supplemental nutrition assistance
 program, the commission shall, except as provided by Subsection (c)
 and Section 33.019, allow a person to comply with initial
 eligibility requirements, including any initial interview, and
 with subsequent periodic eligibility recertification requirements
 by telephone instead of through a personal appearance at commission
 offices if:
 (1)  the person and each member of the person's
 household:
 (A)  have no earned income; and
 (B)  are elderly or persons with disabilities; or
 (2)  the person is subject to a hardship, as determined
 by commission rule.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 33, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 33.019 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.019.  SIMPLIFIED CERTIFICATION AND RECERTIFICATION
 REQUIREMENTS FOR CERTAIN SNAP APPLICANTS AND RECIPIENTS. (a)  The
 commission shall develop and implement simplified certification
 and recertification requirements for supplemental nutrition
 assistance program benefits for an individual who:
 (1)  is 60 years of age or older or is a person with a
 disability, as determined by commission rule; and
 (2)  resides in a household in which every individual
 residing in the household is 60 years of age or older or is a person
 with a disability, as determined by commission rule.
 (b)  The simplified requirements must:
 (1)  allow an individual described by this section to
 waive recertification interview requirements;
 (2)  simplify and reduce the number of verification
 requirements for certifying and recertifying eligibility to
 receive benefits, which must include the use of a shortened
 application form; and
 (3)  allow the individual to remain eligible for
 benefits for 36 months after certification and after each
 recertification.
 (c)  An individual described by this section is required to:
 (1)  submit to the commission a change reporting form
 every 12 months during the 36-month eligibility period; and
 (2)  report to the commission, in accordance with
 federal law, when the individual receives an increase in income.
 (d)  The commission shall, in a manner that complies with
 federal law, use data matching to help enroll in the supplemental
 nutrition assistance program eligible individuals described by
 this section who are receiving Medicaid benefits.  The commission
 may seek or use private funding or contract with a public or private
 entity to carry out this section.
 SECTION 3.  Section 33.019, Human Resources Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to an application or recertification of
 eligibility of a person for supplemental nutrition assistance
 program benefits submitted on or after January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 4.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *