Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB225 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2021

                    By: Paxton S.B. No. 225
 (In the Senate - Filed December 2, 2020; March 3, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 26, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 26, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 225 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of certain child-care facilities and
 family homes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act may be cited as Ellie's Law.
 SECTION 2.  Section 42.025, Human Resources Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.025.  SEARCHABLE DATABASE. (a)  The commission
 [department] shall permanently maintain on the commission's
 [department's] Internet website a searchable database that lists
 [includes the name, the address, and any identification number, as
 applicable, of] each group day-care home and family home licensed,
 registered, or listed under this chapter:
 (1)  that previously had a license, registration, or
 listing under this chapter involuntarily suspended or revoked; or
 (2)  for which the commission refused to renew a
 license, registration, or listing [under this chapter with a
 permanent notation indicating the involuntary suspension or
 revocation and the year in which the suspension or revocation took
 effect or was final under this chapter].
 (b)  The database maintained under Subsection (a) must
 include for each group day-care home and licensed or registered
 family home:
 (1)  the name of the facility;
 (2)  the address of the facility, including the county
 in which the facility is located;
 (3)  any identification number associated with the
 facility;
 (4)  the name of the sole proprietor or each partner who
 owns the child-care operation or, if the owner is a business entity,
 the name of each officer responsible for the management of the
 child-care operation as determined by the commissioner; and
 (5)  the year in which:
 (A)  the involuntary suspension or revocation of
 the facility's license, registration, or listing took effect or was
 final under this chapter; or
 (B)  the commission refused to renew the
 facility's license, registration, or listing.
 (c)  The commission shall include the name of each individual
 described by Subsection (b)(4) who is associated with the license,
 registration, or listing in any database entry made under this
 section.
 (d)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules as necessary
 to implement this section.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter C, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 42.04291 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.04291.  SUPERVISION STANDARDS FOR INFANT DURING TIME
 SPENT ON STOMACH. The executive commissioner by rule shall
 establish standards for the visual and auditory supervision of an
 infant engaged in time on the infant's stomach while awake.  Each
 group day-care home and listed and registered family home shall
 comply with the supervision standards.
 SECTION 4.  Section 42.046, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  An applicant for a license to operate a child-care
 facility, child-placing agency, or continuum-of-care residential
 operation or for a listing or registration to operate a family home
 shall submit to the commission [department] the appropriate fee
 prescribed by Section 42.054 and a completed application on a form
 provided by the commission [department].
 (a-1)  The commission shall require the applicant for a
 license, registration, or listing for a group day-care home or a
 family home to provide the applicant's name and the name of the sole
 proprietor or each partner who owns the child-care operation or, if
 the owner is a business entity, the name of each officer responsible
 for the management of the child-care operation as determined by the
 commissioner on the application form.
 SECTION 5.  Section 42.048, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The commission shall associate a license issued under
 this chapter for a group day-care home with the applicant's name as
 stated in the applicant's license application.
 SECTION 6.  Section 42.050(c), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The commission shall evaluate the application for
 renewal of a license to determine if all licensing requirements are
 met and whether the facility has been cited for repeated violations
 or has established a pattern of violations during the preceding
 five [two] years. The evaluation may include a specified number of
 visits to the facility and must include a review of all required
 forms and records.  If the commission determines the facility has
 repeated violations or an established pattern of violations, before
 the commission renews the license the commission may place
 restrictions, conditions, or additional requirements on the
 license to ensure the violations cease.
 SECTION 7.  Section 42.052, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (l) to read as follows:
 (l)  The commission shall associate a listing or
 registration of a family home issued under this chapter with the
 applicant's name as stated in the applicant's listing or
 registration application.
 SECTION 8.  Subchapter C, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 42.0562 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.0562.  INFORMATION REGARDING CERTAIN GROUP DAY-CARE
 HOME AND FAMILY HOME EMPLOYEES. (a)  The commission shall collect
 information regarding group day-care home and family home employees
 who have had a license, registration, or other occupational
 authorization revoked by a licensing authority.
 (b)  The commission shall collaborate with licensing
 authorities to determine the most efficient method for identifying
 group day-care home or family home employees who have had a license
 revoked by the licensing authority.
 (c)  In this section:
 (1)  "License" means a license, registration,
 certificate, permit, or other authorization issued by a licensing
 authority that a person must obtain to practice or engage in a
 particular business, occupation, or profession.
 (2)  "Licensing authority" means a department,
 commission, board, office, or other agency of the state that issues
 a license.
 SECTION 9.  The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission is required to implement this Act only if
 the legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose.
 If the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the executive commissioner may, but is not required to,
 implement this Act using other appropriations available for the
 purpose.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *