Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB231 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/17/2021

                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 231
 (In the Senate - Filed December 4, 2020; March 3, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 17, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 17, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to training for county election officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 31, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 31.126 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.126.  TRAINING. (a)  In this section, "county
 election officer" has the meaning assigned by Section 31.091(1).
 (b)  The secretary of state shall provide a standardized
 training program and materials for county election officers in the
 same manner it provides such a program to election judges and clerks
 under Subchapter F, Chapter 32.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *