Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB281 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2021

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 281
 (In the Senate - Filed January 4, 2021; March 3, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 15, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 15, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 281 By:  Miles


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of hypnotically induced statements in a
 criminal trial.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 38, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 38.24 to read as follows:
 Art. 38.24.  STATEMENTS OBTAINED BY INVESTIGATIVE HYPNOSIS.
 (a) In this article, "investigative hypnosis" means a technique
 that uses hypnosis to explore the memory of a witness to enhance the
 witness's recall of a legally relevant event, including
 descriptions of people, conversations, and the environment.
 (b)  This article applies to all statements made during a
 hypnotic session by a person who has undergone investigative
 hypnosis for the purpose of enhancing the person's recollection of
 an event at issue in a criminal investigation or case, including
 courtroom testimony regarding those statements and including
 statements identifying an accused that are made pursuant to
 pretrial identification procedures.
 (c)  A statement described by Subsection (b) is not
 admissible against a defendant in a criminal trial, whether offered
 in the guilt or innocence phase or the punishment phase of the
 trial.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 admissibility of a statement in a criminal proceeding that
 commences on or after the effective date of this Act.  The
 admissibility of a statement in a criminal proceeding that
 commences before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect on the date the proceeding commenced, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *