Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB296 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/21/2021

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 296
 (In the Senate - Filed January 7, 2021; March 3, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 21, 2021,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 14, Nays 0; April 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 296 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the date by which a seller must provide resale and
 exemption certificates to the comptroller in connection with a
 sales and use tax audit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 151.054, Tax Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (e)  Properly completed resale or exemption certificates
 should be in the possession of the seller at the time the nontaxable
 transaction occurs. If the seller is not in possession of these
 certificates within 90 [60] days from the date written notice
 requiring possession of them is given to the seller by the
 comptroller or a later date agreed to by the comptroller and the
 seller, deductions claimed by the seller that require delivery of
 the certificates shall be disallowed. [If the seller delivers the
 certificates to the comptroller within the 60-day period, the
 comptroller may verify the reason or basis for exemption claimed in
 the certificates before allowing any deductions.] A deduction may
 not be granted on the basis of certificates delivered to the
 comptroller after the 90-day [60-day] period or, if applicable, the
 date agreed to by the comptroller and the seller.
 (f)  Before allowing a deduction, the comptroller may verify
 the reason or basis for exemption claimed in a resale or exemption
 certificate delivered to the comptroller during the period provided
 by Subsection (e).
 SECTION 2.  Section 151.104, Tax Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (d)  Properly executed resale or exemption certificates
 should be in possession of the seller at the time the nontaxable
 transaction occurs. If the seller is not in possession of these
 certificates within 90 [60] days from the date written notice
 requiring possession of them is given to the seller by the
 comptroller or a later date agreed to by the comptroller and the
 seller, deductions claimed by the seller that require delivery of
 the certificates shall be disallowed. [If the seller acquires
 certificates within the 60-day period, the comptroller may verify
 the reason or basis for exemption claimed in the certificates
 before allowing any deductions.] A deduction may not be granted on
 the basis of certificates obtained after the 90-day [60-day] period
 or, if applicable, the date agreed to by the comptroller and the
 seller.
 (e)  Before allowing a deduction, the comptroller may verify
 the reason or basis for exemption claimed in a resale or exemption
 certificate acquired by the seller during the period provided by
 Subsection (d).
 SECTION 3.  Sections 151.054 and 151.104, Tax Code, as
 amended by this Act, apply to an audit of a seller's sales
 transactions that is pending on or commenced on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *