Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB312 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2021

                    S.B. No. 312


 AN ACT
 relating to the punishment for the criminal offense of improper
 sexual activity with a person in custody; increasing a criminal
 penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.04(b), Penal Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  An offense under Subsection (a)(1) is a Class A
 misdemeanor. An offense under Subsection (a)(2) is a [state jail
 felony, except that an offense under Subsection (a)(2) is a] felony
 of the second degree [if the offense is committed against:
 [(1) an individual in the custody of the Texas Juvenile
 Justice Department or placed in a juvenile facility; or
 [(2) a juvenile offender detained in or committed to a
 correctional facility].
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.  For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 312 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 312 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor