Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB313 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/13/2021

                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 313
 (In the Senate - Filed January 11, 2021; March 9, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 13, 2021,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 15, Nays 0;
 April 13, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a sales and use tax exemption for firearm safety
 equipment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 151.3131 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.3131.  FIREARM SAFETY EQUIPMENT. (a) In this
 section, "firearm safety equipment" means a gun lock box, a gun
 safe, a barrel lock, a trigger lock, or another item designed to
 ensure the safe handling or storage of a firearm.
 (b)  The sale, storage, use, or other consumption of firearm
 safety equipment is exempted from the taxes imposed by this
 chapter.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect tax liability accruing before the effective date of this
 Act. That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been
 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
 the liability for those taxes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *