Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB337 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2021

                    By: Powell S.B. No. 337
 (In the Senate - Filed January 13, 2021; March 9, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs & Border
 Security; April 23, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 April 23, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 337 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the award of grants by the Texas Workforce Commission to
 facilitate the participation of certain veterans and military
 personnel in apprenticeship training programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 302, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 302.00341 to read as follows:
 Sec. 302.00341.  GRANTS TO FACILITATE PARTICIPATION IN
 APPRENTICESHIP TRAINING PROGRAMS BY CERTAIN VETERANS AND MILITARY
 PERSONNEL. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Apprenticeship training program" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 133.001, Education Code.
 (2)  "Nonprofit organization" means an organization
 exempt from federal income taxation under Section 501(a), Internal
 Revenue Code of 1986, as an organization described by Section
 501(c)(3) of that code.
 (b)  The commission shall develop and administer a program
 under which the commission may award grants to one or more nonprofit
 organizations that facilitate the participation in apprenticeship
 training programs of veterans and active duty military service
 members who are transitioning into civilian employment.
 (c)  A grant awarded under this section may be used only to
 recruit or assist veterans or active duty military service members
 who are transitioning into civilian employment to participate in an
 apprenticeship training program in this state.
 (d)  The commission shall adopt rules for the administration
 of this section, including rules for verifying that state funds
 awarded to a nonprofit organization under this section are being
 used appropriately.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Workforce Commission shall adopt rules under
 Section 302.00341, Labor Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  The Texas Workforce Commission is required to
 implement this Act only if the legislature appropriates money
 specifically for that purpose.  If the legislature does not
 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the commission
 may, but is not required to, implement this Act using other
 appropriations available for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *