Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB383 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2021

                    S.B. No. 383


 AN ACT
 relating to disclosure requirements of certain facilities that
 provide care for persons with Alzheimer's disease and related
 disorders.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 242, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 242.0405 to read as follows:
 Sec. 242.0405.  NOTICE OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AND RELATED
 DISORDERS CERTIFICATION. (a) A nursing facility advertising,
 marketing, or otherwise promoting that the facility provides memory
 care services shall prepare a written notice disclosing whether the
 facility is certified or is not certified under Section 242.040 to
 provide specialized care and treatment for facility residents with
 Alzheimer's disease and related disorders.
 (b)  The nursing facility shall provide the notice described
 by Subsection (a) to:
 (1)  each facility resident; and
 (2)  each person applying for services from the
 facility or the person's next of kin or guardian.
 (c)  A nursing facility that provides the notice required
 under Subsection (a) is not required to include the information
 described by Section 242.202(d)(2) in a disclosure statement
 provided under that section.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 247, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 247.0295 to read as follows:
 Sec. 247.0295.  NOTICE OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE OR RELATED
 DISORDERS LICENSE CLASSIFICATION. (a)  An assisted living facility
 advertising, marketing, or otherwise promoting that the facility
 provides memory care services shall provide to each facility
 resident written notice disclosing whether the facility holds a
 license or does not hold a license classified under Section 247.029
 to provide personal care services to residents with Alzheimer's
 disease or related disorders.
 (b)  An assisted living facility that provides the notice
 required under Subsection (a) is not required under Section
 247.026(c-1) to include in the facility's consumer disclosure
 statement information on whether the facility holds a license
 classified under Section 247.029 to provide personal care services
 to residents with Alzheimer's disease or related disorders.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt rules to implement Sections
 242.0405 and 247.0295, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 383 passed the Senate on
 March 29, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1;
 May 25, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2021, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2021, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 30,
 Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 383 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 18, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 100,
 Nays 44, one present not voting; May 27, 2021, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 111, Nays 32, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor