Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB44 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/26/2021

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 44
 (In the Senate - Filed November 9, 2020; March 3, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; March 26, 2021, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 26, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to leave for state employees who are volunteers of certain
 disaster relief organizations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 661, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 661.9075 to read as follows:
 Sec. 661.9075.  VOLUNTEERS OF TEXAS VOLUNTARY ORGANIZATIONS
 ACTIVE IN DISASTER. (a)  A state employee who is a volunteer of an
 organization that is a member of the Texas Voluntary Organizations
 Active in Disaster may be granted leave to participate in disaster
 relief services without a deduction in salary or loss of vacation
 time, sick leave, earned overtime credit, or state compensatory
 time if:
 (1)  the employee's supervisor authorizes the leave;
 and
 (2)  the services in which the employee participates
 are provided for a state of disaster declared by the governor under
 Chapter 418.
 (b)  Leave granted to a state employee under Subsection (a)
 may not exceed 10 days each fiscal year.
 SECTION 2.  Section 661.907, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *