Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB460 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2021

                    By: Lucio, Campbell, Perry S.B. No. 460
 (In the Senate - Filed January 26, 2021; March 9, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs & Border
 Security; April 1, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 1, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating the 11th day of each month as Buddy Check
 Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.083 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.083.  BUDDY CHECK DAY. (a) The 11th day of each
 month is Buddy Check Day to encourage veterans to contact other
 veterans, including those with whom they served, who may need
 assistance.
 (b)  Buddy Check Day may be regularly observed by appropriate
 programs and activities coordinated by the Texas Veterans
 Commission to promote assistance and other services available to
 veterans and promote education and awareness of issues facing
 veterans.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *