Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB481 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2021

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 481
 (In the Senate - Filed January 27, 2021; March 9, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 1, 2021,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 1, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 481 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of certain public school students to a
 school district offering in-person instruction.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 25, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 25.045 to read as follows:
 Sec. 25.045.  TRANSFER TO DISTRICT OFFERING IN-PERSON
 INSTRUCTION. (a) In this section, "virtual instruction" means
 instructional activities delivered to students primarily over the
 Internet.
 (b)  If a school district provides notice to the parent or
 person standing in parental relation to a student enrolled in the
 district of the district's intent to offer only virtual instruction
 for more than one grading period during a school year, the student
 may transfer for that school year to another school district that:
 (1)  offers in-person instruction during that school
 year; and
 (2)  accepts the student's transfer.
 (c)  A student who transfers to another school district under
 this section may not be charged tuition. The student is included in
 the average daily attendance of the district in which the student
 attends school.
 (d)  The commissioner may adopt rules necessary to implement
 this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2021-2022
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *