Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB500 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2021

                    By: Miles S.B. No. 500
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2021; March 9, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 26, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 26, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating the criminal offense of operating a boarding
 home facility without a permit in certain counties and
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 260, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 260.0051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 260.0051.  CRIMINAL PENALTY. (a)  This section applies
 only to a county or municipality that requires a person to obtain a
 permit to operate a boarding home facility as authorized by Section
 260.004.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person operates a
 boarding home facility without a permit in a county or municipality
 to which this section applies.
 (c)  An offense under this section is a Class B misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *