S.B. No. 500 AN ACT relating to creating the criminal offense of operating a boarding home facility without a permit and to a study regarding the regulation of group homes. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 260, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 260.0051 to read as follows: Sec. 260.0051. CRIMINAL PENALTY. (a) This section applies only to a county or municipality that requires a person to obtain a permit to operate a boarding home facility as authorized by Section 260.004. (b) A person commits an offense if the person operates a boarding home facility without a permit in a county or municipality to which this section applies. (c) An offense under this section is a Class B misdemeanor. SECTION 2. (a) The Health and Human Services Commission shall conduct a study on state and local regulation of group homes. (b) The study must: (1) identify and evaluate state laws relating to the regulation of group homes, including: (A) a boarding home facility, as defined by Section 260.001, Health and Safety Code; and (B) a community home, described by Chapter 123, Human Resources Code; (2) analyze the procedures for filing complaints against group homes and make recommendations to expedite complaint processes; (3) analyze complaints filed against group homes in the preceding 10 years; (4) analyze the enforcement authority over group homes granted to state and local governmental agencies, including the authority of counties and municipalities to enforce boarding home regulations; (5) recommend whether additional state and local governmental enforcement authority over group homes is needed; (6) recommend processes to expedite the licensing of and regulatory procedures for group homes; (7) determine whether new categories of group homes should be licensed or regulated by state or local governmental agencies; (8) discuss and recommend methods for identifying unlicensed group homes; and (9) evaluate whether Section 260.011, Health and Safety Code, which prohibits a county or municipality from excluding boarding home facilities from residential areas by zoning and similar regulations, prevents certain counties and municipalities from regulating boarding home facilities. (c) Not later than December 1, 2022, the Health and Human Services Commission shall prepare a written or electronic report that includes a summary of the results of the study conducted under this section and any legislative recommendations based on the study and submit the report to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and members of the standing committees of the senate and the house of representatives with jurisdiction over the Health and Human Services Commission. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 500 passed the Senate on April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 500 passed the House, with amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 92, Nays 55, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor