Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB503 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2021

                    By: Miles S.B. No. 503
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2021; March 9, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 19, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 19, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 503 By:  Miles


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating the criminal offense of failing to report
 abuse, neglect, or exploitation in boarding home facilities by
 certain persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 260, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 260.0091 to read as follows:
 Sec. 260.0091.  REQUIRED REPORTING OF ABUSE, NEGLECT, OR
 EXPLOITATION BY A LESSOR; CRIMINAL PENALTY. (a)  A person commits
 an offense if the person:
 (1)  leases to another a building owned by the person
 that is being operated as a boarding home facility;
 (2)  has actual knowledge that a resident of the
 boarding home facility is being or has been abused, neglected, or
 exploited; and
 (3)  fails to report the abuse, neglect, or
 exploitation to the Department of Family and Protective Services
 for investigation by that agency.
 (b)  An offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *