Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB504 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/27/2021

                    By: Miles S.B. No. 504
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2021; March 9, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 27, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 1; April 27, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authority of a county fire marshal to inspect group
 homes and assisted living facilities; authorizing a fee; creating a
 criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 352, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 352.0165 to read as follows:
 Sec. 352.0165.  INSPECTION OF GROUP HOMES AND ASSISTED
 LIVING FACILITIES; FEE. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Assisted living facility" means a facility
 licensed under Chapter 247, Health and Safety Code.
 (2)  "Group home" means an establishment:
 (A)  in which three or more individuals who are
 unrelated to the owner or operator of the establishment reside;
 (B)  that provides residential care services to
 residents; and
 (C)  that receives payment or other compensation
 from a local, state, or federal governmental entity for providing
 residential care services to a resident.
 (3)  "Residential care services" means shelter,
 protection, meals, health care, mobility assistance, and personal
 care services, including bathing, dressing, and eating.
 (b)  On the complaint of any person, the county fire marshal,
 at any reasonable time, may enter:
 (1)  a building in the county in which a group home or
 assisted living facility is operated; and
 (2)  the premises of a building described by
 Subdivision (1).
 (c)  The county fire marshal shall order the removal of a
 building in which a group home or assisted living facility is
 located, the removal of a structure located on the premises of a
 building in which a group home or assisted living facility is
 located, or other remedial action if the marshal finds that:
 (1)  the building or structure, because of lack of
 repair, age, dilapidated condition, or other reason, is susceptible
 to fire and is so located or occupied that fire would endanger
 persons or property in the building or structure or on the premises
 of the building or structure;
 (2)  a dangerous condition is created by:
 (A)  an improper arrangement of stoves, ranges,
 furnaces, or other heating appliances, including chimneys, flues,
 and pipes with which they are connected, or by their lighting
 systems or devices; or
 (B)  the manner of storage of explosives,
 compounds, petroleum, gasoline, kerosene, dangerous chemicals,
 vegetable products, ashes, or combustible, flammable, or refuse
 materials; or
 (3)  any other condition exists that is dangerous or is
 liable to cause or promote fire or create danger for firefighters,
 occupants, or other buildings or structures.
 (d)  The person to whom an order under Subsection (c) is
 directed shall immediately comply with the order. The marshal may,
 if necessary, apply to a court of competent jurisdiction for writs
 or orders necessary to enforce this section, and the court may grant
 appropriate relief. The marshal is not required to give a bond.
 (e)  The commissioners court of a county may adopt any
 appropriate standard developed by a nationally recognized
 standards-making association under which the county fire marshal
 may enforce this section, except that standards adopted under this
 subsection do not apply in a municipality that has adopted fire
 protection ordinances.
 (f)  The commissioners court of a county shall prescribe a
 reasonable fee for an inspection performed by the county fire
 marshal that may be charged to a property owner or occupant who
 requests the inspection, as the commissioners court considers
 appropriate. In prescribing the fee, the commissioners court shall
 consider the overall cost to the marshal to perform the
 inspections, including the approximate amount of time the staff of
 the marshal needs to perform an inspection, travel costs, and other
 expenses.
 SECTION 2.  Section 352.022, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 352.022.  PENALTY FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ORDER. An
 owner or occupant who is subject to an order issued under Section
 352.016 or 352.0165 commits an offense if that person fails to
 comply with the order. Each refusal to comply is a separate
 offense. The offense is a Class B misdemeanor unless it is shown on
 the trial of the offense that the defendant has been previously
 convicted two or more times under this section, in which event the
 offense is a state jail felony.
 SECTION 3.  Section 352.022, Local Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to an offense committed on or
 after the effective date of this Act. An offense committed before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on
 the date the offense was committed, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this section, an
 offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if any
 element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *