Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB54 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2021

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 54
 (In the Senate - Filed November 9, 2020; March 3, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 54 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report by the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board regarding best practices for assisting students
 with autism spectrum disorder.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.06694 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.06694.  STUDY AND REPORT ON ASSISTING STUDENTS WITH
 AUTISM SPECTRUM DISORDER. (a)  The board shall conduct a study to
 determine best practices for assisting students with autism
 spectrum disorder who are enrolled at institutions of higher
 education.
 (b)  The study must:
 (1)  identify and track:
 (A)  the number of students with autism spectrum
 disorder who graduate from secondary schools in this state;
 (B)  the number of students with autism spectrum
 disorder who are enrolled at institutions of higher education;
 (C)  the student financial assistance available
 to students with autism spectrum disorder who enroll at
 institutions of higher education; and
 (D)  the graduation rates of students with autism
 spectrum disorder who enroll at institutions of higher education;
 and
 (2)  identify and examine best practices and program
 modules from public and private institutions of higher education
 outside this state that have achieved successful results in working
 with students with autism spectrum disorder.
 (c)  In conducting the study, the board:
 (1)  shall collaborate with the Texas Education Agency
 regarding specialized programs offered by elementary or secondary
 schools for students with autism spectrum disorder to determine how
 those programs could be replicated at or extended to postsecondary
 institutions; and
 (2)  may not request, require, or use personally
 identifiable student information.
 (d)  Not later than December 1, 2023, the board shall submit
 to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, and the commissioner of education a written
 report that includes the study's findings and any recommendations
 for legislative or other action.
 (e)  This section expires January 1, 2024.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *