Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB59 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/21/2021

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 59
 (In the Senate - Filed November 9, 2020; March 3, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the advertising and promotion of a state purchasing
 program for local governments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 271.082, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The comptroller may advertise in any available media or
 otherwise promote the purchasing program to further the purposes of
 this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *