Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB604 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2021

                    S.B. No. 604


 AN ACT
 relating to bonds issued by and the dissolution of municipal
 management districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter M, Chapter 375, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 375.2621 to read as follows:
 Sec. 375.2621.  PROHIBITION ON ISSUANCE OF BONDS AFTER
 PETITION. If a petition for dissolution under Section 375.262 is
 filed with the board, the board must consider the petition not later
 than the 60th day after the date the petition is filed. The
 district may not issue bonds secured by assessments after the date
 the board confirms that the petition is valid and complete under
 Section 375.262.
 SECTION 2.  Section 375.264, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 375.264.  LIMITATIONS [LIMITATION] ON DISSOLUTION BY
 BOARD OF DISTRICT WITH DEBT. (a) A district may not be dissolved by
 its board under Section 375.261 or after a petition is filed under
 Section 375.262 if the district has [any] outstanding bonded
 indebtedness until that bonded indebtedness has been repaid or
 defeased in accordance with the order or resolution authorizing the
 issuance of the bonds.
 (b)  If a petition for dissolution is filed under Section
 375.262 with the board of a district and the district has
 outstanding bonded indebtedness secured by assessments:
 (1)  the district shall remain in existence solely for
 the purposes of winding up district operations and discharging its
 bonded indebtedness; and
 (2)  the board shall use all district money that is
 available to:
 (A)  wind up district operations; and
 (B)  repay or defease the bonded indebtedness as
 soon as practicable in accordance with the order or resolution
 authorizing the issuance of the bonds.
 (c)  Subsection (b) does not apply to a district that has
 outstanding bonded indebtedness secured by a source other than
 assessments on the date the petition is filed with the board.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a municipal management district that is the subject of a petition
 described by Section 375.262, Local Government Code, filed with the
 board on or after the effective date of this Act. A district that is
 the subject of such a petition filed with the board before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the petition was filed, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act may not be
 construed to impair an obligation under a contract entered into
 before the effective date of this Act. A political subdivision may
 fulfill the subdivision's obligations under a contract entered into
 before that date but may not extend such a contract beyond the
 contract's original term.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 604 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 604 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor