Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB64 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/22/2021

                    By: Nelson, Johnson S.B. No. 64
 (In the Senate - Filed November 9, 2020; March 3, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 March 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 22, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 64 By:  Buckingham


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a peer support network for certain law enforcement
 personnel.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter M-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER M-1. PEER SUPPORT NETWORK FOR LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS
 Sec. 1701.621.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Law enforcement officer" means a person
 identified as a peace officer under Article 2.12(1), (2), (3), or
 (4), Code of Criminal Procedure.
 (2)  "Peer" means a person who is a law enforcement
 officer or retired law enforcement officer.
 Sec. 1701.622.  GENERAL POWERS AND DUTIES. (a) The
 commission shall develop a peer support network for law enforcement
 officers. The network must include:
 (1)  peer-to-peer support;
 (2)  training for peer service coordinators and peers
 that includes suicide prevention training;
 (3)  technical assistance for program development,
 peer service coordinators, licensed mental health professionals,
 and peers; and
 (4)  identification, retention, and screening of
 licensed mental health professionals.
 (b)  As part of the peer support network for law enforcement
 officers, the commission shall ensure law enforcement officers have
 support in both urban and rural jurisdictions.
 (c)  The commission shall solicit and ensure that
 specialized training is provided to persons who are peers and who
 want to provide peer-to-peer support and other peer-to-peer
 services under the network.
 (d)  The commission may adopt rules necessary to implement
 this subchapter.
 Sec. 1701.623.  CONTRACT WITH INSTITUTION OF HIGHER
 EDUCATION. The commission may contract with an institution of
 higher education that has appropriate expertise in mental health or
 law enforcement to develop the peer support network under this
 subchapter.
 Sec. 1701.624.  CONFIDENTIALITY OF PARTICIPANT INFORMATION.
 Information relating to a law enforcement officer's participation
 in peer-to-peer support and other peer-to-peer services under the
 network is confidential and may not be disclosed under Chapter 552,
 Government Code, by:
 (1)  the commission;
 (2)  a law enforcement agency that employs a law
 enforcement officer participant; or
 (3)  any other state agency or political subdivision in
 this state that employs a law enforcement officer participant.
 Sec. 1701.625.  PROTECTIONS RELATED TO LICENSURE. A law
 enforcement officer's participation in peer-to-peer support and
 other peer-to-peer services under the network may not:
 (1)  serve as the basis for a revocation, suspension,
 or denial of a license issued under this chapter; or
 (2)  be considered in any proceeding related to the
 officer's licensure under this chapter.
 Sec. 1701.626.  ANNUAL REPORT. Not later than December 1 of
 each year, the commission shall submit a report to the governor and
 the legislature that includes:
 (1)  the number of law enforcement officers who
 received peer support through the peer support network for law
 enforcement officers;
 (2)  the number of peers and peer service coordinators
 trained;
 (3)  an evaluation of the services provided under this
 subchapter; and
 (4)  recommendations for program improvements.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2022, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall develop the peer support
 network for law enforcement officers, as required under Subchapter
 M-1, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *