Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB640 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2021

                    S.B. No. 640


 AN ACT
 relating to a study on the interoperability needs and technology
 readiness of behavioral health service providers in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
 Commission.
 (2)  "Executive commissioner" means the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
 (b)  The commission shall conduct a study to assess the
 interoperability needs and technology readiness of behavioral
 health service providers in this state, including the needs and
 readiness of each:
 (1)  state hospital, as defined by Section 552.0011,
 Health and Safety Code;
 (2)  local mental health authority, as defined by
 Section 531.002, Health and Safety Code;
 (3)  freestanding psychiatric hospital;
 (4)  high volume provider group under the STAR+PLUS,
 STAR Kids, or STAR Health Medicaid managed care programs;
 (5)  Medicaid payor;
 (6)  county jail, municipal jail, and other local law
 enforcement entity involved in providing behavioral health
 services; and
 (7)  trauma service area regional advisory council.
 (c)  In conducting the study under Subsection (b) of this
 section, the commission shall determine which of the providers
 described by that subsection use an electronic health record
 management system and evaluate:
 (1)  for each of those providers that use an electronic
 health record management system:
 (A)  when the provider implemented the electronic
 health record management system;
 (B)  whether the provider is also connected to a
 system outside of the provider's electronic health record
 management system and, if the provider is connected to an outside
 system:
 (i)  to what outside system the provider is
 connected and how the provider is connected;
 (ii)  what type of information the provider
 shares with the outside system, including information on admissions
 or discharges, dispensing of medication, and clinical notes; and
 (iii)  what type of information the provider
 receives from the outside system, including new patient information
 and the receipt of real time notifications of patient events; and
 (C)  what the provider finds valuable about using
 an electronic health record management system or being connected to
 an outside system, including:
 (i)  whether the provider uses a
 prescription drug monitoring program as part of the electronic
 health record management system or the outside system and the
 provider's reason for using or not using a prescription drug
 monitoring program, as applicable;
 (ii)  whether, in using the electronic
 health record management system or being connected to an outside
 system, the provider finds valuable the use of qualitative data for
 improving patient care; and
 (iii)  the provider's opinion on the
 efficiency and cost-effectiveness of using an electronic health
 record management system or being connected to an outside system;
 and
 (2)  for both the providers who use an electronic
 health record management system or an outside system and the
 providers who do not use either system, barriers to being connected
 or to becoming connected, as applicable, including:
 (A)  whether they consider any of the following a
 barrier:
 (i)  the cost of using either system;
 (ii)  security or privacy concerns with
 using either system;
 (iii)  patient consent issues associated
 with using either system; or
 (iv)  legal, regulatory, or licensing
 factors associated with using either system; and
 (B)  for the providers who are not connected to
 either system, whether and for what reasons they consider being
 connected valuable or useful to treating patients.
 (d)  In conducting the study under Subsection (b) of this
 section, the commission may collaborate with any relevant advisory
 committees.
 (e)  Based on the results of the study conducted under
 Subsection (b) of this section and not later than August 31, 2022,
 the commission shall prepare and submit to the legislature,
 lieutenant governor, and governor a written report that includes:
 (1)  a state plan, including a proposed timeline, for
 aligning the interoperability and technological capabilities in
 the provision of behavioral health services with applicable law,
 including:
 (A)  the 21st Century Cures Act (Pub. L.
 No. 114-255);
 (B)  federal or state law on health information
 technology; and
 (C)  the delivery system reform incentive payment
 program and uniform hospital rate increase program;
 (2)  information on gaps in education, and
 recommendations for closing those gaps, regarding the appropriate
 sharing of behavioral health data, including education on:
 (A)  the sharing of progress notes versus
 psychotherapy notes;
 (B)  obtaining consent for electronic data
 sharing; and
 (C)  common provider and patient
 misunderstandings of applicable law;
 (3)  an evaluation of the differences and similarities
 between federal and state law on the interoperability and
 technological requirements in the provision of behavioral health
 services; and
 (4)  recommendations for standardizing the use of
 social determinants of health.
 (f)  To the extent permitted by law and as the executive
 commissioner determines appropriate, the commission shall
 implement, within the commission's prescribed authority, a
 component of the plan or a regulatory recommendation included in
 the report required under Subsection (e) of this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 640 passed the Senate on
 April 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 640 passed the House on
 May 26, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 99, Nays 48, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor