Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB646 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2021

                    By: Schwertner, Bettencourt, Buckingham S.B. No. 646
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 1, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 3; April 1, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 646 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to county approval of certain proposed purchases or
 conversions of properties to house homeless individuals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 233, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter G to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER G.  APPROVAL FOR PURCHASE OR USE CONVERSION OF PROPERTY
 TO HOUSE HOMELESS INDIVIDUALS
 Sec. 233.201.  COUNTY APPROVAL. (a)  A person, including a
 political subdivision, may not purchase property to house homeless
 individuals unless the commissioners court of the county in which
 the property is located approves a plan described by Section
 233.202(b).
 (b)  A person may not convert the use of a property owned by
 the person to enable the property to house homeless individuals
 unless the commissioners court of the county in which the property
 is located approves a plan that meets the requirements of Section
 233.202(b).
 Sec. 233.202.  PLAN REQUIREMENTS. (a)  In this section,
 "proposed new residents" means homeless individuals the applicant
 intends to house at the purchased or converted property.
 (b)  A plan required by Section 233.201 must describe:
 (1)  the availability of local health care for proposed
 new residents, including access to Medicaid services and mental
 health services;
 (2)  the availability of indigent services for proposed
 new residents;
 (3)  the availability of reasonably affordable public
 transportation for proposed new residents;
 (4)  local law enforcement resources in the area of the
 property; and
 (5)  the steps the applicant has taken to coordinate
 with the local mental health authority to provide for any proposed
 new residents.
 (c)  An applicant shall respond to reasonable requests for
 additional information made by the commissioners court regarding
 the proposed property purchase or use conversion.
 Sec. 233.203.  NOTICE. A person who intends to purchase or
 convert property to house homeless individuals shall:
 (1)  post notice of the proposed use of the property at
 the property not later than the 61st day before the proposed date of
 purchase or conversion; and
 (2)  publish notice of the proposed purchase or
 conversion of the property for 10 consecutive days in a newspaper of
 general circulation in the county in which the property is located,
 with the first day being not later than the 61st day before the
 proposed date of purchase or conversion.
 Sec. 233.204.  EXCEPTION. This subchapter does not apply to
 the purchase or use conversion of a property to provide temporary
 shelter or housing during a natural disaster, declared state of
 emergency, or other life-threatening public emergency.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a purchase or use conversion described by Subchapter G, Chapter
 233, Local Government Code, as added by this Act, that is not final
 on the effective date of this Act.  A purchase or use conversion
 that was final before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect when the purchase or use conversion was completed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *