By: Schwertner, Buckingham, Springer S.B. No. 655 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2021; March 11, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; April 20, 2021, rereferred to Committee on Administration; April 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 21, 2021, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 655 By: Huffman A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the sale of distilled spirits to ultimate consumers by the holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Sections 14.05(c) and (f), Alcoholic Beverage Code, are amended to read as follows: (c) The holder of a distiller's and rectifier's permit may not under Subsection (b) sell more than four [two] 750 milliliter bottles of distilled spirits or the equivalent to the same consumer within a 30-day period. (f) The permit holder must [check a purchaser's identification and] keep records of sales [purchases] in a manner that enables the permit holder to comply with this section. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. * * * * *