Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB669 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/29/2021

                    By: Springer S.B. No. 669
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture &
 Rural Affairs; March 29, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 29, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain reports created by the Texas Water Development
 Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 16.403(d), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  The [Not later than January 1 of each odd-numbered year,
 the] board shall make publicly available [submit to the legislature
 a report that includes] the most recent data relating to:
 (1)  statewide water usage in the residential,
 industrial, agricultural, commercial, and institutional sectors;
 and
 (2)  the data collection and reporting program
 developed under Subsection (c).
 SECTION 2.  Section 201.0227(d-1), Agriculture Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *