Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB672 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/22/2021

                    By: Buckingham, et al. S.B. No. 672
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 March 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 672 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to Medicaid coverage of certain collaborative care
 management services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 32.024, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (oo) to read as follows:
 (oo)  The commission shall provide medical assistance
 reimbursement to a treating health care provider who participates
 in Medicaid for the provision to a child or adult medical assistance
 recipient of behavioral health services that are classified by a
 Current Procedural Terminology code as collaborative care
 management services.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *