Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB676 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/23/2021

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             March 23, 2021       TO: Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: SB676 by Springer (Relating to the continuation of the Red River Boundary Commission.), As Introduced     No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated. The bill continues the Red River Boundary Commission until December 31, 2023 and requires the commission to issue a final report no later than July 30, 2023.Based on information provided by the General Land Office and the Soil and Water Conservation Board, it is assumed that duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished in utilizing existing resources. The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a two-thirds majority vote in both houses; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2021.  Local Government ImpactNo significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.  Source Agencies: b > td > 305 General Land Office, 592 Soil and Water Conservation Board  LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, AJL, MW, DA

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 23, 2021

 

 

  TO: Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: SB676 by Springer (Relating to the continuation of the Red River Boundary Commission.), As Introduced   

TO: Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB676 by Springer (Relating to the continuation of the Red River Boundary Commission.), As Introduced

 Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development

 Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 SB676 by Springer (Relating to the continuation of the Red River Boundary Commission.), As Introduced 

 SB676 by Springer (Relating to the continuation of the Red River Boundary Commission.), As Introduced 



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

The bill continues the Red River Boundary Commission until December 31, 2023 and requires the commission to issue a final report no later than July 30, 2023.Based on information provided by the General Land Office and the Soil and Water Conservation Board, it is assumed that duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished in utilizing existing resources. The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a two-thirds majority vote in both houses; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2021.



Based on information provided by the General Land Office and the Soil and Water Conservation Board, it is assumed that duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished in utilizing existing resources. 



The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a two-thirds majority vote in both houses; otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2021.

 Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 305 General Land Office, 592 Soil and Water Conservation Board

305 General Land Office, 592 Soil and Water Conservation Board

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, AJL, MW, DA

JMc, AJL, MW, DA