Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB69 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/21/2021

                    By: Miles S.B. No. 69
 (In the Senate - Filed November 9, 2020; March 3, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 21, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 69 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting peace officers from using neck restraints
 during a search or arrest.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 2.33 to read as follows:
 Art. 2.33.  USE OF NECK RESTRAINTS DURING SEARCH OR ARREST
 PROHIBITED. A peace officer may not intentionally use a choke hold,
 carotid artery hold, or similar neck restraint in searching or
 arresting a person unless the restraint is necessary to prevent
 serious bodily injury to or the death of the officer or another
 person.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *